TN SJR0108 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges resolution of societal problems stemming from fatherless homes and divorce.
Title
Urges resolution of societal problems stemming from fatherless homes and divorce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 69 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 69 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-15 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2017-04-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0241) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |