TN SJR0094 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

American Heart Association/National Wear Red Day, February 5, 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize the American Heart Association's annual National Wear Red Day® on February 5, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-02-11SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-02-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-02-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-02-10SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-02-10HouseConcurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-02-09HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/10/21
2021-02-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-02-08SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2021-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback