TN SJR0093 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Supports permitting states to disqualify enrollees convicted of criminal offenses involving Medicaid or TennCare fraud or illegal sale of prescription drugs.
Title
Supports permitting states to disqualify enrollees convicted of criminal offenses involving Medicaid or TennCare fraud or illegal sale of prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | Ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/7/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |