TN SJR0081 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Tom Cigarran, Chairman of the Board of Nashville Predators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tom Cigarran, Chairman of the Board of Nashville Predators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-02-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-02-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-02-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-02-06SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-02-04HouseConcurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-01-31HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2-4-19
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-01-31SenateAdopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-01-29SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 1/31/2019
2019-01-28SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-01-19SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback