TN SJR0060 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment of the Tennessee Constitution to authorize lotteries to benefit 501(c)(19) organizations when such lotteries are authorized by a two-thirds vote of the General Assembly.
Title
Proposes amendment of the Tennessee Constitution to authorize lotteries to benefit 501(c)(19) organizations when such lotteries are authorized by a two-thirds vote of the General Assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. S&L Govt. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. S&L Govt. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 87, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reset on Next Regular cal. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reset on Reg cal. fpr 3/17/14 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed on 1st Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/5/2014 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 6, PNV 1 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed S. on 3rd Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/28/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed S. on 2nd Reading |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Passed S. on 1st Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Rec. for adoption, by S. Jud. Comm., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Filed for intro. |