TN SJR0029 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sumner County Board of Education, 2020 TSBA School Board of the Year
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend the Sumner County Board of Education upon being named the Tennessee School Boards Association's 2020 School Board of the Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-02-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-02-08 | House | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-01-15 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/8/21 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/15/2021 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |