TN SJR0025 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

"Color Chattanooga Pink Week," January 14-21, 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize "Color Chattanooga Pink Week," January 14-21, 2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2023-04-03HouseRef. to Health Committee
2023-03-30SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-03-30SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2023-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/30/2023
2023-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/27/2023
2023-03-21SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-01-20SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2023-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback