TN SJR0012 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses by Governor Haslam on State of the State and State budget, January 30, 2017; authorizes transmittal of budget document.
Title
Addresses by Governor Haslam on State of the State and State budget, January 30, 2017; authorizes transmittal of budget document.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-01-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-01-12 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0012&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SJR0012.pdf |