TN SB7047 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds to requirements for school safety plans that the plans include measures to ensure district employees, including substitute teachers, have classroom access to communications devices that allow for immediate contact with first responders. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to school safety plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Senate | Lay on the Table |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 8/23/2023 |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB7095 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration