TN SB3813 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the date of the city election to coincide with the November general election; extends the four-year terms of office of the mayor and councilmen elected at the regular city election held in June 2009 and the councilmen elected at the regular city election held in June 2011 to expire on the first Thursday in November in 2013 and 2015 respectively. - Amends Chapter 247 of the Acts of 1905; as amended and rewritten.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the date of the city election to coincide with the November general election; extends the four-year terms of office of the mayor and councilmen elected at the regular city election held in June 2009 and the councilmen elected at the regular city election held in June 2011 to expire on the first Thursday in November in 2013 and 2015 respectively. - Amends Chapter 247 of the Acts of 1905; as amended and rewritten.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pr. Ch. 78 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-05-01 | Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 0 | |
2012-05-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-30 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2012-04-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-04-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3883 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 78