TN SB3811 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the employee representative on the advisory council on workers compensation from organized labor must be selected from a list of three "nominees," instead of "names," provided by the state labor council of the AFL-CIO. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 50 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the employee representative on the advisory council on workers compensation from organized labor must be selected from a list of three "nominees," instead of "names," provided by the state labor council of the AFL-CIO. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 50 and Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3325 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA of Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3811&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3811.pdf |