TN SB3733 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes mayor to appoint executive director for metropolitan development and housing agency beginning on September 1, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 20.
Title
As introduced, authorizes mayor to appoint executive director for metropolitan development and housing agency beginning on September 1, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Withdrawn. | |
2010-03-15 | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2418 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3733&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3733.pdf |