TN SB3678 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for Tennessee opting out of federal aid highway program and electing instead to retain state's contributions to federal highway trust fund each fiscal year, if and when Congress enacts legislation to permit such action. - Amends TCA Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, provides for Tennessee opting out of federal aid highway program and electing instead to retain state's contributions to federal highway trust fund each fiscal year, if and when Congress enacts legislation to permit such action. - Amends TCA Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-05-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-05-13 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-13 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1273) | |
2010-05-11 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/13/2010 | |
2010-05-10 | S. Reset on cal. for 05/13/2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/10/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Ref to: S. FW&M Comm. w/ recommend | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3509 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-23 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M