TN SB3603 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1047
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1047
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee State Fair and Exposition Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 12; Title 43 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee State Fair and Exposition Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 12; Title 43 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. S&L Govt. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. S&L Govt. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1047 | |
2012-04-30 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1366) | |
2012-04-30 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1129) | |
2012-04-30 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1128) | |
2012-04-30 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-27 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-27 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-30 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. - for review | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3208 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1047