TN SB3524 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that Share the Road new specialty earmarked plates be redesigned for reissuance; redesign to be made in consultation with Jeff Roth Cycling Foundation and the majority caucus whip of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, requires that Share the Road new specialty earmarked plates be redesigned for reissuance; redesign to be made in consultation with Jeff Roth Cycling Foundation and the majority caucus whip of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-05-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-05-13 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-13 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1274) | |
2010-05-11 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/13/2010 | |
2010-05-10 | S. Reset on cal. for 05/13/2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/10/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. Trans Consent cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3366 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-23 - Action Def. in Transportation Committee to Omnibus Bill