TN SB3404 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes an impact note to be prepared upon request by two or more members of the general assembly that describes the effect on business of any general bill. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, authorizes an impact note to be prepared upon request by two or more members of the general assembly that describes the effect on business of any general bill. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-04-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-04-01 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-01 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1057) | |
2010-03-30 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/01/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3501 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010