TN SB3402 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes resort in Crab Orchard from definition of premier type tourist resort; removes one of the duplicated definitions of Nashville Shores. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102(24).
Title
As introduced, removes resort in Crab Orchard from definition of premier type tourist resort; removes one of the duplicated definitions of Nashville Shores. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102(24).
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Faulk [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-04-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-04-15 | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/15/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3400 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG