TN SB3388 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, applies loans protected under the Tennessee Home Loan Protection Act of 2006 to include purchase money mortgages as well as non-purchase money mortgages; creates a pilot project in Shelby County for voluntary mediation prior to the foreclosure of loans entered into under such act. - Amends TCA Title 35 and Title 45, Chapter 20, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, applies loans protected under the Tennessee Home Loan Protection Act of 2006 to include purchase money mortgages as well as non-purchase money mortgages; creates a pilot project in Shelby County for voluntary mediation prior to the foreclosure of loans entered into under such act. - Amends TCA Title 35 and Title 45, Chapter 20, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-03-29 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/29/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3593 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-30 - Failed for Lack of Second in: Utilities & Banking of COM
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3388&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3388.pdf |