TN SB3269 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 90 to 60 days period in which dealer via signed statement can deduct on a return sales tax collected but not yet remitted to commissioner for refunded items. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55; Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, reduces from 90 to 60 days period in which dealer via signed statement can deduct on a return sales tax collected but not yet remitted to commissioner for refunded items. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55; Title 57 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-05-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/17/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3467 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-03 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3269&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3269.pdf |