TN SB3200 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Gov't Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Gov't Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the governor and members of the general assembly from creating or controlling multicandidate political campaign committees. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the governor and members of the general assembly from creating or controlling multicandidate political campaign committees. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Gov't Comm | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2431 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3200&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3200.pdf |