TN SB2925 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, requires that newly elected officials take office after the certification of election results at the first meeting of the legislative body following an election rather than immediately after the election to allow for a more timely transition of officeholders. - Amends Chapter 75 of the Private Acts of 2005; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 75 of the Private Acts of 2005; as amended by Chapter 112 of the Private Acts of 2006 and Chapter 67 of the Private Acts of 2016; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter of the City of Munford.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 59 | |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2908 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Pr. Ch. 59