TN SB2923 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, establishes the Community Investment Trust, the Park and Recreation Restricted Account, and the Transportation Restricted Account for purposes of funding certain community projects in the City of Murfreesboro. - Amends Chapter 429 of the Private Acts of 1931.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 429 of the Private Acts of 1931; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to creating and funding certain trusts and accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 62 | |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2903 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Pr. Ch. 62