TN SB2915 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes proration of the registration fee for freight motor vehicles operated for commercial purposes upon the death of an eligible operator of the freight motor vehicle; requires submission of certain documentation prior to issuance of a refund for the unused portion of the registration fee paid. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 4, relative to vehicle registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1089) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1089) |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0532) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0612) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1805 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.