TN SB2911 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends certain for-hire motor carrier provisions to any motor vehicle transporting passengers who are TennCare enrollees eligible for such transportation services under TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 65.
Title
As enacted, extends certain for-hire motor carrier provisions to any motor vehicle transporting passengers who are TennCare enrollees eligible for such transportation services under TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 65.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1013 | |
2010-05-24 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1389) | |
2010-05-24 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3025 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 1013