TN SB2889 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to submit a report concerning the standards for parental involvement in public schools that it has developed to the chairs of the senate and house education committees by November 1, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to submit a report concerning the standards for parental involvement in public schools that it has developed to the chairs of the senate and house education committees by November 1, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3030 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2889&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2889.pdf |