TN SB2880 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds a notice requirement that sales of property forfeited under the fish and wildlife or boating laws, and sales of interests in energy-related resources by or on behalf of the commission or the wildlife resources agency be continuously publicly advertised on the department of general service's website for the 90-day period immediately preceding the date of the sale; makes certain requirements for sales of state property applicable to TWRA surplus; redirects revenue from surplus and forfeiture sales from wildlife fund to general fund. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12; Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 12; Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70, relative to disposition of property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2411 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee