TN SB2872 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Effective date(s) 06/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Effective date(s) 06/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a task force to study retirement benefits for law enforcement officers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35 and Title 8, Chapter 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35 and Title 8, Chapter 36, relative to retirement benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Effective date(s) 06/03/2022 | |
2022-06-06 | Pub. Ch. 1146 | |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1016) |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0823) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0902) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2572 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1146