TN SB2827 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 805
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 805
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, urges the comptroller to study the number of inmates in county jails who have been incarcerated for offenses for which they have not been convicted. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 41.
Title
As enacted, urges the comptroller to study the number of inmates in county jails who have been incarcerated for offenses for which they have not been convicted. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 805 | |
2010-04-27 | Effective date(s) 04/20/10 | |
2010-04-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-13 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-04-13 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-04-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-04-08 | Passed H., Ayes 84, Nays 5, PNV 2 | |
2010-04-08 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-04-07 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-04-07 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-07 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1114) | |
2010-04-05 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-30 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2915 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 805