TN SB2801 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes certain exemptions to the prohibition on the department of motor vehicles knowingly disclosing or otherwise making available to any person or entity personal information about any person obtained by the department in connection with a motor vehicle record. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 25.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 25, relative to the Uniform Motor Vehicle Records Disclosure Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1077 | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2763 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022