TN SB2783 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TSSAA to have member schools perform background checks on applicants for coaching or coaching assistant positions, including volunteer positions, before having contact with students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires TSSAA to have member schools perform background checks on applicants for coaching or coaching assistant positions, including volunteer positions, before having contact with students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3028 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2783&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2783.pdf |