TN SB2763 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts the diabetic supplies of blood glucose monitor test strips, lancets and visual reading and urine test strips from the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, exempts the diabetic supplies of blood glucose monitor test strips, lancets and visual reading and urine test strips from the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/26/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/26/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/ recommend | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/14/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2945 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/24/2012
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2763&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2763.pdf |