TN SB2757 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds witness intimidation, discrimination, and drive-by-shootings as aggravating factors for purposes of imposing death sentence in first degree murder cases. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, adds witness intimidation, discrimination, and drive-by-shootings as aggravating factors for purposes of imposing death sentence in first degree murder cases. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-22 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2918 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010