TN SB2756 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class E felony of a public official intentionally making a statement or distributing information to the public concerning public health, when the official knows or reasonably should know that the statement or information is false; defines "public official" as a person who has been elected to a position in local, state, or federal government. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to misconduct involving public officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2576 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee