TN SB2752 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to submit to the legislature a quarterly report on the public health impacts of gun violence on local communities, including data on the deaths, disabilities, and economic hardships stemming from gun violence, data on mental health ailments of perpetrators of gun violence, and research-based information from which to make informed decisions on how best to protect Tennesseans from gun violence. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, relative to the public health effects of gun violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2599 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Failed in Health Committee