TN SB2712 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 921
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 921
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of correction to study how to reduce the state's correctional healthcare costs. - Amends TCA Title 41.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of correction to study how to reduce the state's correctional healthcare costs. - Amends TCA Title 41.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 921 | |
2012-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/12 | |
2012-05-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-04-29 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-27 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-23 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-23 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0942) | |
2012-04-23 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-03-19 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-03-15 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-15 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0829) | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 2/28/12 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2917 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 921