TN SB2692 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 994
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 994
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing plat approval by regional and municipal planning commissions. - Amends TCA Section 13-3-402 and Section 13-4-302.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 13-3-402 and Section 13-4-302, relative to planning commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 994 | |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Comittee to 03/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 3/22/22 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2534 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2022