TN SB2672 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds a fourth general sessions court in Rutherford County, the judge of which shall be elected to a six-year initial term in the August 2016 general election, and eight-year terms thereafter, effective upon 2/3 vote of the local legislative body. - Amends Chapter 384 of the Private Acts of 1947; as amended.
Title
As introduced, adds a fourth general sessions court in Rutherford County, the judge of which shall be elected to a six-year initial term in the August 2016 general election, and eight-year terms thereafter, effective upon 2/3 vote of the local legislative body. - Amends Chapter 384 of the Private Acts of 1947; as amended.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 40 | |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2647 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pr. Ch. 40
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2672&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB2672.pdf |