TN SB2668 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that for the purposes of sexual exploitation of children offenses, the term "material" includes computer-generated images created, adapted, or modified by artificial intelligence; defines "artificial intelligence." - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to the sexual exploitation of children.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2163 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.