TN SB2662 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the penalty from a Class D felony to a Class B felony for a person who negligently, by act or omission, engages in conduct that places a child eight years of age or less in imminent danger of death, bodily injury, or physical or mental impairment. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to offenses against children.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 885 | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1817 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024