TN SB2660 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, require the department to file a petition of termination of adoptive parent's parental rights with a juvenile court, within 90 days of the juvenile courts finding that there has been substantial noncompliance by a parent or guardian with the statement of responsibilities in a permanency plan. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to the termination of parental rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-08 | Pub. Ch. 652 | |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 66, Nays 22, PNV 5 |
2024-03-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0693) |
2024-03-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 22, Nays 6 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0544) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1808 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 652