TN SB2650 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Class C felony offense of acquiring or otherwise exercising control over bees or a structure or equipment used to keep, handle, house, exhibit, breed, or offer for sale bees, without the consent of the owner and with the intent to deprive the owner of the bees, structure, or equipment. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 43.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 43, relative to animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 708 | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2024-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2848 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 708