TN SB2630 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Pharmacy Act." - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to medication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to next calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2744 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee