TN SB2623 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, includes Campbell County and Union County in the list of participating counties on the residential home for the aged program. - Amends TCA Section 12-4-320.
Title
As introduced, includes Campbell County and Union County in the list of participating counties on the residential home for the aged program. - Amends TCA Section 12-4-320.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Faulk [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - S.GW,H&HR COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - S.GW,H&HR COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-02-08 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-02-08 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 02/08/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 02/03/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2520 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010