TN SB2619 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises provisions governing weekly benefit so that instead of reducing a claimant's weekly benefit by that part of wages in excess of $50.00 or 25 percent of the claimant's weekly benefit amount, requires that a claimant's weekly benefit amount be reduced by that part of wages in excess of $200; prohibits a claimant from working more than 18 hours during a week in which the claimant receives a benefit. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50, Chapter 7, relative to unemployment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2505 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee