TN SB2597 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits restraining any inmate engaged in work within or outside of a prison, jail, or workhouse facility in a manner that joins the inmate with one or more other inmates. - Amends TCA Title 41.
Title
As introduced, prohibits restraining any inmate engaged in work within or outside of a prison, jail, or workhouse facility in a manner that joins the inmate with one or more other inmates. - Amends TCA Title 41.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee / no second |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2496 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee