TN SB2593 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Teacher Residency Program Grant Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Teacher Residency Program Grant Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2447 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Def. to Summer Study in Education Administration & Planning