TN SB2593 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the town's elections from March in odd numbered years to coincide with the regular November election in even numbered years; extends terms in order to move election dates. - Amends Chapter 133 of the Private Acts of 1986; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the town's elections from March in odd numbered years to coincide with the regular November election in even numbered years; extends terms in order to move election dates. - Amends Chapter 133 of the Private Acts of 1986; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 52 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Comp. HB subst. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | P2C held on desk. Local Bill |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2505 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-22 - Pr. Ch. 52