TN SB2576 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 643
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 643
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates a certain segment of State Highway 28 in Sequatchie and Marion counties as "Veterans' Memorial Park Highway."
Title
As enacted, designates a certain segment of State Highway 28 in Sequatchie and Marion counties as "Veterans' Memorial Park Highway."
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 643 | |
2012-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/30/12 | |
2012-03-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-03-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-03-12 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-12 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-02-09 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-02-06 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-02-06 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/6/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 2/1/2012 | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2688 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 643