TN SB2576 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 648
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 648
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the requirement that any land use decisions made by a legislative body or planning commission after the adoption of a general regional plan be consistent with the plan to also apply to a board of zoning appeals when such board is exercising its powers on matters other than variances. - Amends TCA Section 13-3-304(b) and Section 13-4-202(b)(2)(B)(iii).
Title
As enacted, extends the requirement that any land use decisions made by a legislative body or planning commission after the adoption of a general regional plan be consistent with the plan to also apply to a board of zoning appeals when such board is exercising its powers on matters other than variances. - Amends TCA Section 13-3-304(b) and Section 13-4-202(b)(2)(B)(iii).
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Pub. Ch. 648 | |
2010-03-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2010-03-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-03-08 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 03/08/2010 | |
2010-03-01 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-01 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0945) | |
2010-03-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-02-22 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-02-22 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-19 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 02/22/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2709 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 648