TN SB2569 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, restructures the board of regents; establishes state university boards of trustees; makes other changes necessary to effectuate the restructuring; revises the composition of the Tennessee higher education commission - Amends TCA Section 12-3-102; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, restructures the board of regents; establishes state university boards of trustees; makes other changes necessary to effectuate the restructuring; revises the composition of the Tennessee higher education commission - Amends TCA Section 12-3-102; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Education Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Education Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869 | |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Education Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2578 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 869